|
Federal
41 |
Ontario
30 June 2014
By-Election
First-past-the-post |
Gov't |
CPC |
ID: 26008(F) — 2 Apr 2022 21:59 ET |
|
✓ |
→ New to Parliament |
Age
47 |
LIB |
1/5 |
12,868 |
59.38% |
+6,524 |
Loser: |
CPC |
6,344 |
29.27% |
Trevor Ellis |
Service: 1 year 3 months 18 days (Oppo.) |
|
|
Federal
42 |
Ontario
19 October 2015
General
First-past-the-post |
Gov't |
LIB |
ID: 7500(F) — 3 Feb 2022 07:57 ET |
|
✓ |
Re-elected incumbent |
Age
48 |
LIB |
1/5 |
21,587 |
51.95% |
+5,785 |
Loser: |
CPC |
15,802 |
38.03% |
Bin Chang |
After his election: |
14 Sep 2017 |
50 |
LIB |
→ |
Vac. |
Died in office |
|
Service: 1 year 10 months 26 days (Gov't) |
|
|
Federal
42 |
Ontario
11 December 2017
By-Election
First-past-the-post |
Gov't |
LIB |
ID: 11761(F) — 16 Aug 2021 01:29 ET |
|
— |
Deceased |
Age
50 |
|
|
|
|
|
Successor: |
LIB |
9,088 |
49.41% |
Jean Yip |
|